AL HB168 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Delivered to Governor at 1:24 p.m. on May 3, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Delivered to Governor at 1:24 p.m. on May 3, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Schools, enrollment date, age 6, allow enrollment in first grade in the enrolling school district, Sec. 16-28-4 am'd.
Title
Schools, enrollment date, age 6, allow enrollment in first grade in the enrolling school district, Sec. 16-28-4 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:24 p.m. on May 3, 2016. |
2016-04-28 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-297. |
2016-04-28 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-05-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 888 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-04-28 | House | Enrolled |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs |
2016-03-22 | House | Hanes intended to vote "Nay" |
2016-03-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 336 |
2016-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |