AL HB16 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-23 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
Pending: Senate Local Legislation No. 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-23 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
Pending: Senate Local Legislation No. 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Montgomery, clothing, wearing of garments that expose underwear, prohibited in public places, civil penalties
Title
Montgomery, clothing, wearing of garments that expose underwear, prohibited in public places, civil penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-02-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 33 | |
2012-02-16 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Montgomery County Legislation |