AL HB158 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-22 - Delivered to Governor at 3:52 p.m. on February 22, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-22 - Delivered to Governor at 3:52 p.m. on February 22, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limestone Co., communication districts authorized to contract and cooperate with emergency communication distrct or public safety agency in a neighboring state
Title
Limestone Co., communication districts authorized to contract and cooperate with emergency communication distrct or public safety agency in a neighboring state
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Whitt [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 354 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - SBIR: Melson motion to Adopt Roll Call 353 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 10 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 47 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2022-02-03 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 9 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 37 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - HBIR: Whitt motion to Adopt Roll Call 8 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 39 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - SBIR: Melson motion to Adopt Roll Call 353 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 10 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 47 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2022-02-03 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 9 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 37 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - HBIR: Whitt motion to Adopt Roll Call 8 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 39 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:52 p.m. on February 22, 2022. |
2022-02-22 | House | Engrossed |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-67. |
2022-02-22 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-22 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 354 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2022-02-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 10 |
2022-02-03 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 9 |
2022-02-03 | House | Limestone County Legislation Amendment Offered |
2022-02-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-01-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Limestone County Legislation |