AL HB156 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to state, county, and municipal sales and use taxes; to amend Section 40-23-5, Code of Alabama 1975, to exempt capital expenditures of the Birmingham Zoo from state, county, and municipal sales and use taxes through September 30, 2027.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state, county, and municipal sales and use taxes; to amend Section 40-23-5, Code of Alabama 1975, to exempt capital expenditures of the Birmingham Zoo from state, county, and municipal sales and use taxes through September 30, 2027.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-25 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-25HouseEnacted
2023-05-25HouseEnrolled
2023-05-25SenateReady to Enroll
2023-05-25SenateRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-05-25SenateOn Third Reading in Second House
2023-05-17SenateRead Second Time in Second House
2023-05-17SenateReported Out of Committee in Second House
2023-05-17SenateReported Favorably from Senate Finance and Taxation Education
2023-05-02SenateReferred to Committee to Senate Finance and Taxation Education
2023-05-02HouseRead First Time in Second House
2023-05-02HouseRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-05-02HouseOn Third Reading in House of Origin
2023-04-27HouseRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-04-26HouseReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-04-26HouseReported Favorably from House Ways and Means Education
2023-03-21HouseIntroduced and Referred to House Ways and Means Education
2023-03-21HouseRead First Time in House of Origin

Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback