AL HB154 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 1:39 p.m. on April 22, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 1:39 p.m. on April 22, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Campaign finance reports, electronic filing with Secretary of State required, revise report deadline, Secs. 17-5-4, 17-5-5, 17-5-8, 17-5-9, 17-5-10, 17-5-11, 17-5-19.1, 17-5-19.2 am'd.
Title
Campaign finance reports, electronic filing with Secretary of State required, revise report deadline, Secs. 17-5-4, 17-5-5, 17-5-8, 17-5-9, 17-5-10, 17-5-11, 17-5-19.1, 17-5-19.2 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Whitt [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1146 (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1145 (Y: 9 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-04-22 - Senate - SBIR: Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 1144 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 601 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - HBIR: Whitt motion to Adopt Roll Call 600 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1145 (Y: 9 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-04-22 - Senate - SBIR: Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 1144 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 601 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - HBIR: Whitt motion to Adopt Roll Call 600 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:39 p.m. on April 22, 2021. |
2021-04-22 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-314. |
2021-04-22 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-04-22 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1146 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 1145 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Singleton Amendment Offered |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2021-04-01 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 601 |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 5 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 5 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 5 | 19.1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 5 | 19.2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 5 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 5 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 5 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |