AL HB149 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Forwarded to Governor at 3:34 p.m. on March 21, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Poarch Creek Indians, granted police powers under certain conditions, employment of police officers , Secs. 36-21-120 to 36-21-124, inclusive, am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Poarch Creek Indians, granted police powers under certain conditions, employment of police officers , Secs. 36-21-120 to 36-21-124, inclusive, am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 76 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseForwarded to Governor at 3:34 p.m. on March 21, 2018.
2018-03-21HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-393.
2018-03-21HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-21SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-21HouseEnrolled
2018-03-21HousePassed Second House
2018-03-21SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 931
2018-03-21SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-27SenateMarsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-02-27SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-02-22SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-20SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2018-02-15HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 362
2018-02-15HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-01HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback