AL HB148 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Forwarded to Secretary of State at 11:59 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Forwarded to Secretary of State at 11:59 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tuscaloosa Co. and Jefferson Co., sewer systems, privately owned in City of Lakeview and unincorp. area of Tuscaloosa Co., reg. by Public Service Comm. from Jan. 2023 to Dec. 2027, const. amend.
Title
Tuscaloosa Co. and Jefferson Co., sewer systems, privately owned in City of Lakeview and unincorp. area of Tuscaloosa Co., reg. by Public Service Comm. from Jan. 2023 to Dec. 2027, const. amend.
Sponsors
Rep. Rich Wingo [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Motion to adopt Local Application Resolution Roll Call 1112 (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1111 (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1110 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt Roll Call 1109 (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Wingo motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1027 (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Wingo motion to Local Application Roll Call 323 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 322 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - HBIR: Wingo motion to Adopt Roll Call 321 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1111 (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1110 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt Roll Call 1109 (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Wingo motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1027 (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Wingo motion to Local Application Roll Call 323 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 322 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - HBIR: Wingo motion to Adopt Roll Call 321 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Forwarded to Secretary of State at 11:59 p.m. on April 7, 2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-288. |
2022-04-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2022-04-07 | House | Wingo motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1027 |
2022-04-07 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Motion to adopt Local Application Resolution lost Roll Call 1112 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1111 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1110 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Singleton Amendment Offered |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Allen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1109 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Allen Amendment Offered |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Singleton motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2022-02-24 | House | Wingo motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 323 |
2022-02-24 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 322 |
2022-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-09 | House | Rereferred from Calendar to TCL |
2022-02-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-13 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |