AL HB146 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wastewater treatment facilities, loan payback period by local governing bodies extended, Sec. 22-34-11 am'd.
Title
Wastewater treatment facilities, loan payback period by local governing bodies extended, Sec. 22-34-11 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 385 (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - HBIR: Wood (R) motion to Adopt Roll Call 384 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - HBIR: Wood (R) motion to Adopt Roll Call 384 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2021-03-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 385 |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |