AL HB14 | 2015 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Delivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Delivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Talladega Co., sales and use tax in unincorporated areas, distrib. of revenue from shooting ranges for resurfacing co. roads, Act 91-533, 1991 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Title
Talladega Co., sales and use tax in unincorporated areas, distrib. of revenue from shooting ranges for resurfacing co. roads, Act 91-533, 1991 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 60 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2015-08-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 58 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2015-08-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 64 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2015-08-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 60 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2015-08-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 58 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2015-08-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 64 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-10 | House | Delivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015. |
2015-08-10 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-515. |
2015-08-10 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-08-10 | House | Enrolled |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-08-10 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 52 |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-08-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2015-08-05 | House | Engrossed |
2015-08-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 24 |
2015-08-05 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 23 |
2015-08-05 | House | Hurst first Substitute Offered |
2015-08-05 | House | Hurst motion to reconsider adopted voice vote |
2015-08-05 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-08-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 6 |
2015-08-05 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-08-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-08-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |