AL HB137 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-11 - Referred to Committee to Senate Finance and Taxation Education
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to sales and use taxes; to amend Section 40-23-5, Code of Alabama 1975, to provide an exemption from state, county, and municipal sales and use taxes for the Black Belt Regional Child Advocacy Center in Marengo County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to sales and use taxes; to amend Section 40-23-5, Code of Alabama 1975, to provide an exemption from state, county, and municipal sales and use taxes for the Black Belt Regional Child Advocacy Center in Marengo County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-09 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-11SenateReferred to Committee to Senate Finance and Taxation Education
2023-05-11HouseRead First Time in Second House
2023-05-09HouseRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-05-09HouseOn Third Reading in House of Origin
2023-04-27HouseRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-04-26HouseReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-04-26HouseReported Favorably from House Ways and Means Education
2023-04-19HouseCarry Over by House Ways and Means Education
2023-03-21HouseIntroduced and Referred to House Ways and Means Education
2023-03-21HouseRead First Time in House of Origin

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback