AL HB135 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Forwarded to Executive Department on April 6, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Forwarded to Executive Department on April 6, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Education budget, appropriations for the support, maintenance, and development of public education
Title
Education budget, appropriations for the support, maintenance, and development of public education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - Garrett motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 929 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 881 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 880 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 879 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 493 (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 491 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 881 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 880 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 879 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 493 (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 491 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Forwarded to Executive Department on April 6, 2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-393. |
2022-04-06 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-06 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2022-04-06 | House | Garrett motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 929 |
2022-04-06 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 881 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 880 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Smitherman Amendment Offered |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 879 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Orr first Substitute Offered |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Orr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education first Substitute Offered |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2022-03-08 | House | Engrossed |
2022-03-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 493 |
2022-03-08 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 492 |
2022-03-08 | House | Garrett Amendment Offered |
2022-03-08 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 491 |
2022-03-08 | House | Ways and Means Education first Substitute Offered |
2022-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2022-01-13 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
Same As/Similar To
SB151 (Same As) 2022-02-01 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education