AL HB135 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gambling device, crime of possession of a gambling device, slot machine manufactured before 1960 exempt from under certain limited circumstances, Sec. 13A-12-27 am'd.
Title
Gambling device, crime of possession of a gambling device, slot machine manufactured before 1960 exempt from under certain limited circumstances, Sec. 13A-12-27 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Chip Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 52 (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - HBIR: Brown (C) motion to Adopt Roll Call 51 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - HBIR: Brown (C) motion to Adopt Roll Call 51 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 52 |
2021-02-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |