AL HB134 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Delivered to Governor at 4:24 p.m. on March 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Delivered to Governor at 4:24 p.m. on March 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pike Co., bd. of registrars, expense allowance and compensation, add'l., payable from co. gen. fund
Title
Pike Co., bd. of registrars, expense allowance and compensation, add'l., payable from co. gen. fund
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Boothe [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 68 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2016-02-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 68 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:24 p.m. on March 1, 2016. |
2016-03-01 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-54. |
2016-03-01 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 250 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2016-02-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 31 |
2016-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |