AL HB125 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Delivered to Governor at 1:30 p.m. on April 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Delivered to Governor at 1:30 p.m. on April 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jacksonville, alcoholic beverages, sale everyday of the week, regulation by city authorized
Title
Jacksonville, alcoholic beverages, sale everyday of the week, regulation by city authorized
Sponsors
Rep. K.L. Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 65 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 65 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:30 p.m. on April 6, 2017. |
2017-04-06 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-145. |
2017-04-06 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-04-06 | House | Enrolled |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 453 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2017-03-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 280 |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-14 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |