AL HB123 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Forwarded to Governor on April 27, 2021 at 6:02 p.m. on April 27, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Forwarded to Governor on April 27, 2021 at 6:02 p.m. on April 27, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Voter registration lists, prosecutors, judges, and law enforcement officers, a registered voter or spouse authorized to have personal info omitted, Sec. 17-4-33 am'd.
Title
Voter registration lists, prosecutors, judges, and law enforcement officers, a registered voter or spouse authorized to have personal info omitted, Sec. 17-4-33 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - Faulkner motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 997 (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1081 (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt Roll Call 1080 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt Roll Call 1079 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 450 (Y: 72 N: 12 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 449 (Y: 31 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - House - HBIR: Faulkner motion to Adopt Roll Call 448 (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1081 (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt Roll Call 1080 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt Roll Call 1079 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 450 (Y: 72 N: 12 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 449 (Y: 31 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - House - HBIR: Faulkner motion to Adopt Roll Call 448 (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Forwarded to Governor on April 27, 2021 at 6:02 p.m. on April 27, 2021. |
2021-04-27 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-335. |
2021-04-27 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-04-27 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-04-27 | House | Wheeler intended to vote "Yea" |
2021-04-27 | House | Faulkner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 997 |
2021-04-27 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1081 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1080 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2021-03-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 450 |
2021-03-16 | House | Clarke motion to Withdraw adopted Voice Vote |
2021-03-16 | House | Clarke Amendment Offered |
2021-03-16 | House | Motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 449 |
2021-03-16 | House | Jones (S) Amendment Offered |
2021-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SB33 (Same As) 2021-02-02 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs