AL HB12 | 2015 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:13 a.m. on September 16, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Nursing homes, beds, privilege tax assessment, supplement for fiscal years 2016 and 2017, contigent on minimum general fund appropriations to Medicaid, Sec. 40-26B-21 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nursing homes, beds, privilege tax assessment, supplement for fiscal years 2016 and 2017, contigent on minimum general fund appropriations to Medicaid, Sec. 40-26B-21 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-15 - House - Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 54 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-09-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-15 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 2 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-09-15 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 53 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-16HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:13 a.m. on September 16, 2015.
2015-09-16HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-536.
2015-09-16HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-09-16SenateSignature Requested
2015-09-16SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2015-09-15HouseEnrolled
2015-09-15HouseColeman and Garrett intended to vote "Nay" and Fridy and Greer intended to vote "Yea"
2015-09-15HouseClouse motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 64
2015-09-15HouseConcurrence Requested
2015-09-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 52
2015-09-15SenateHoltzclaw motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 51
2015-09-15SenateHoltzclaw Amendment Offered
2015-09-15SenateReed motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 50
2015-09-15SenateReed Amendment Offered
2015-09-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-09-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-09-10SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2015-09-10HouseBeech intended to vote "Yea" and Garrett intended to vote "Abstain"
2015-09-10HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 4
2015-09-10HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-09-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-09-08HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB12
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015SS/PrintFiles/HB12-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=530545&VOTE=4&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531770&VOTE=50&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531775&VOTE=51&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531781&VOTE=52&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531799&VOTE=64&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback