AL HB12 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 6:13 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DeKalb Co., co. offices, vacancies, special election under certain conditions, Amendment 845 (Section 1.50, Local Amendments, DeKalb County, Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901, as amended), am'd., const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DeKalb Co., co. offices, vacancies, special election under certain conditions, Amendment 845 (Section 1.50, Local Amendments, DeKalb County, Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901, as amended), am'd., const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-08-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-10HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 6:13 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
2015-08-10HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-08-10HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-501.
2015-08-10HouseEnrolled
2015-08-10SenateSignature Requested
2015-08-10HousePassed Second House
2015-08-10SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 51
2015-08-10SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-08-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2015-08-06HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 26
2015-08-06HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-08-05HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback