AL HB117 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and offenses, secondary metals recyclers, requirements for purchase, possession, and sale of detached catalytic converters, Secs. 13A-8-37.3 added; Sec. 13A-8-31.1, 13A-8-37.1 am'd.
Title
Crimes and offenses, secondary metals recyclers, requirements for purchase, possession, and sale of detached catalytic converters, Secs. 13A-8-37.3 added; Sec. 13A-8-31.1, 13A-8-37.1 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 198 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 197 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - HBIR: Lee motion to Adopt Roll Call 196 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 197 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - HBIR: Lee motion to Adopt Roll Call 196 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-16 | House | Engrossed |
2022-02-16 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2022-02-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 198 |
2022-02-16 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 197 |
2022-02-16 | House | Lee Amendment Offered |
2022-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-13 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13A | 8 | 31.1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13A | 8 | 37.1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13A | 8 | 37.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |