AL HB115 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Finance and Taxation General Fund first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Finance and Taxation General Fund first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lawrence and Limestone Counties, Board of Registrars, maximum number of days increased, Sec. 17-3-8 am'd.
Title
Lawrence and Limestone Counties, Board of Registrars, maximum number of days increased, Sec. 17-3-8 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 53 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - HBIR: Robertson motion to Adopt Roll Call 52 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - HBIR: Robertson motion to Adopt Roll Call 52 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund first Amendment Offered |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2022-02-08 | House | Sanderford intended to vote "Yea" |
2022-02-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 53 |
2022-02-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-13 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
Same As/Similar To
SB285 (Same As) 2022-03-01 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund