AL HB115 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on March 9, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on March 9, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limited partnerships, Uniform Limited Partnership Act, effective date for certain limited partnerships changed from January 1, 2012, to January 1, 2011, to coincide with the effective date of the new business and nonprofit entities code, Act 2009-621, 2009 Reg. Sess. am'd.; Sec. 10-9C-1206 am'd.
Title
Limited partnerships, Uniform Limited Partnership Act, effective date for certain limited partnerships changed from January 1, 2012, to January 1, 2011, to coincide with the effective date of the new business and nonprofit entities code, Act 2009-621, 2009 Reg. Sess. am'd.; Sec. 10-9C-1206 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on March 9, 2010. | |
2010-03-09 | Assigned Act No. 2010-211 on 03/22/2010. | |
2010-03-09 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-03-09 | Signature Requested | |
2010-03-09 | Enrolled | |
2010-03-09 | Passed Second House | |
2010-03-04 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 459 | |
2010-03-04 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-02 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2010-01-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 115 | |
2010-01-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |