AL HB11 | 2010 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-15 - Delivered to Governor at 7:45 p.m.on December 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Ethics Law, lobbying, definition to include activity with any branch of state government, maintenance of electronic database, mandatory ethics training for public officers or employees and lobbyists, certain representation by legislators prohibited, Sec. 36-25-1.5 added

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ethics Law, lobbying, definition to include activity with any branch of state government, maintenance of electronic database, mandatory ethics training for public officers or employees and lobbyists, certain representation by legislators prohibited, Sec. 36-25-1.5 added

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - DeMarco motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-12-15 Delivered to Governor at 7:45 p.m.on December 15, 2010.
2010-12-15 Assigned Act No. 2010-762.
2010-12-15 Clerk of the House Certification
2010-12-15 Enrolled
2010-12-15 Signature Requested
2010-12-15 Concurred in Second House Amendment
2010-12-15 DeMarco motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 61
2010-12-15 Concurrence Requested
2010-12-14 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 39
2010-12-14 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 38
2010-12-14 Holtzclaw Amendment Offered
2010-12-14 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 37
2010-12-14 Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered
2010-12-14 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 36
2010-12-14 Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered
2010-12-14 Died in Committee on 12/16/2010
2010-12-13 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2010-12-10 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections
2010-12-10 Engrossed
2010-12-10 Cosponsors Added
2010-12-10 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 4
2010-12-10 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 3
2010-12-10 Ethics Amendment reported
2010-12-10 Third Reading Passed
2010-12-09 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2010-12-08 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ethics

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB11
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2010RS/PrintFiles/HB11-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=393485&VOTE=3&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=393486&VOTE=4&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=393487&VOTE=5&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394015&VOTE=36&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394016&VOTE=37&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394018&VOTE=38&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394019&VOTE=39&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=394478&VOTE=61&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1054&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback