AL HB108 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Industry Recognized and Registered Apprenticeship Program Act, Alabama Office of Apprenticeship created to administer state programs in lieu of federal office, apprenticeship tax credit and aggregate apprenticeship tax credit increases, Secs. 40-18-422, 40-18-423, 40-18-424 am'd.
Title
Alabama Industry Recognized and Registered Apprenticeship Program Act, Alabama Office of Apprenticeship created to administer state programs in lieu of federal office, apprenticeship tax credit and aggregate apprenticeship tax credit increases, Secs. 40-18-422, 40-18-423, 40-18-424 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2019-05-07 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-07 | House | Rafferty intended to vote "Yea" |
2019-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 562 |
2019-05-07 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 561 |
2019-05-07 | House | Ways and Means Education first Substitute Offered |
2019-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2019-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |