AL HB102 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to Escambia County; to authorize the county commission to provide a supplemental salary to the sheriff for the performance of additional duties relating to the operation of the county pound.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Escambia County; to authorize the county commission to provide a supplemental salary to the sheriff for the performance of additional duties relating to the operation of the county pound.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-27 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 88 Abs: 9) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-27HouseEnacted
2023-04-27HouseEnrolled
2023-04-27SenateReady to Enroll
2023-04-27SenateRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-04-27SenateOn Third Reading in Second House
2023-04-25SenateRead Second Time in Second House
2023-04-25SenateReported Out of Committee in Second House
2023-04-25SenateReported Favorably from Senate Local Legislation
2023-04-11SenateReferred to Committee to Senate Local Legislation
2023-04-11HouseRead First Time in Second House
2023-04-11HouseRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-04-11HouseOn Third Reading in House of Origin
2023-04-06HouseRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-04-06HouseReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-04-06HouseReported Favorably from House Local Legislation
2023-03-07HouseIntroduced and Referred to House Local Legislation
2023-03-07HouseRead First Time in House of Origin

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback