AL HB1 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-11 - Motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

General fund budget, appropriations for ordinary expenses of executive, legislative, and judicial departments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General fund budget, appropriations for ordinary expenses of executive, legislative, and judicial departments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-10 - House - Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 2 N: 92 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2015-08-10 - House - Holmes (A) motion to Adjourn (Y: 9 N: 81 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2015-08-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-10 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 53 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 46 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 45 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2015-08-05 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-11HouseMotion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-11HouseConcurrence Requested
2015-08-10HousePERMISSION GRANTED
2015-08-10HouseClouse motion to Concur In and Adopt lost Roll Call 48
2015-08-10HouseHolmes (A) motion to Adjourn lost Roll Call 47
2015-08-10HouseClouse motion to Concur In and Adopt offered
2015-08-10HouseConcurrence Requested
2015-08-10SenateMarsh motion to Reconsider and Table adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-10SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 61
2015-08-10SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 60
2015-08-10SenateOrr first Substitute Offered
2015-08-10SenateOrr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-10SenateFinance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered
2015-08-10SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-08-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2015-08-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2015-08-05HouseEngrossed
2015-08-05HouseJones intended to vote "Nay"
2015-08-05HouseGreer intended to vote "Yea" and Faulkner intended to vote "Nay"
2015-08-05HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 22
2015-08-05HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 21
2015-08-05HouseWays and Means General Fund Amendment Offered
2015-08-05HouseClouse motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-05HouseMotion to Adopt lost Roll Call 11
2015-08-05HouseClouse to reconsider W&MGF amendment adopted voice vote
2015-08-05HouseClouse motion to Table adopted Roll Call 10
2015-08-05HouseHammon to reconsider motion to temp carry over adopted voice vote
2015-08-05HouseWarren Amendment Offered
2015-08-05HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-08-05HouseWays and Means General Fund Amendment Offered
2015-08-05HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2015-08-04HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-08-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB1
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015FS/PrintFiles/HB1-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=528498&VOTE=10&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1066&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=528499&VOTE=11&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1066&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=528581&VOTE=21&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1066&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=528582&VOTE=22&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1066&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=529445&VOTE=60&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1066&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=529446&VOTE=61&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1066&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=529556&VOTE=47&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1066&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=529557&VOTE=48&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1066&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback