AK SR9 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - SENATE RESOLVE 10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - SENATE RESOLVE 10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to management of public land and resources in the state.
Title
Public Land/resource Management
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: (Y: 8 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage Amendment No. 1 (Y: 8 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage Amendment No. 1 (Y: 8 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Senate | SENATE RESOLVE 10 |
2018-06-27 | Senate | 2:43 PM 5/24/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-27 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-04-14 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N3 A1 |
2018-04-14 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2018-04-14 | Senate | AM NO 1 FAILED Y8 N11 A1 |
2018-04-14 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-14 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(S.RES) |
2018-04-10 | Senate | DP: GIESSEL, BISHOP, COGHILL, STEDMAN, MEYER |
2018-04-10 | Senate | RES RPT 5DP |
2018-04-04 | Senate | RES |
2018-04-04 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |