AK SR9 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-12 - PERMANENTLY FILED 2/10 SENATE RESOLVE 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-12 - PERMANENTLY FILED 2/10 SENATE RESOLVE 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dedicating a committee room in the Thomas B. Stewart Legislative Office Building to former Senator William Beltz.
Title
Committee Room Named After William Beltz
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | PERMANENTLY FILED 2/10 SENATE RESOLVE 6 | |
2010-01-27 | 9:30 AM 1/26/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-01-25 | RESOLUTION REPRINTED 01/25/10 | |
2010-01-19 | PASSED Y19 N- E1 | |
2010-01-19 | TAKEN UP ON FINAL PASSAGE | |
2010-01-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME |