AK SR8 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - SENATE RESOLVE NO. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Proclaiming February 2018 as Black History Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

February 2018: Black History Month

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05SenateSENATE RESOLVE NO. 9
2018-03-05Senate4:28 PM 3/1/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-02-14SenatePASSED Y18 N- E1 V1
2018-02-14SenateMICCICHE, HUGHES, EGAN, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, WILSON, KELLY
2018-02-14SenateCOSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, VON IMHOF, BISHOP, STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, STEVENS, MACKINNON
2018-02-14SenateBEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
2018-02-14SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-02-13SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 2/14/2018
2018-02-07SenateFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-02-07SenateDP: MEYER, WILSON, GIESSEL, COGHILL, EGAN
2018-02-07SenateSTA RPT 5DP
2018-01-26SenateSTA
2018-01-26SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback