AK SR7 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - SENATE RESOLVE NO. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Dedicating the fourth floor Senate conference room of the Alaska State Capitol to the late Senate President Jan Faiks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dedicating The Jan Faiks Conference Room

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05SenateSENATE RESOLVE NO. 8
2018-03-05Senate4:28 PM 3/1/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-02-09SenateHUGHES, MEYER, KELLY
2018-02-09SenateCOSPONSOR(S): MACKINNON, BISHOP, STEDMAN, MICCICHE, HOFFMAN, STEVENS, VON IMHOF
2018-02-09SenatePASSED Y18 N- E1 V1
2018-02-09SenateBEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
2018-02-09SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-02-09SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 2/9/2018
2018-02-07SenateFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-02-07SenateDP: MEYER, WILSON, GIESSEL, COGHILL, EGAN
2018-02-07SenateSTA RPT 5DP
2018-01-26SenateSTA
2018-01-26SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback