AK SR3 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/28 SENATE RESOLVE 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/28 SENATE RESOLVE 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ngo Support For State Veterans
Title
Ngo Support For State Veterans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-05 | Senate | PERMANENTLY FILED 7/28 SENATE RESOLVE 3 |
2022-10-05 | Senate | 9:40 A.M. 6/27/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-04-11 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N- E2 A2 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | MICCICHE |
2022-04-11 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, HOLLAND, KAWASAKI, BISHOP, STEVENS, MYERS, REVAK, WILSON |
2022-04-11 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2022-04-11 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-04-11 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | DP: SHOWER, REINBOLD, HOLLAND, KAWASAKI |
2022-03-11 | Senate | STA RPT 4DP |
2022-02-04 | Senate | STA |
2022-02-04 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |