AK SR3 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on November 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-18 - PERMANENTLY FILED 11/13 SENATE RESOLVE 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Proclaiming February 2017 as Black History Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

February 2017: Black History Month

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-18SenatePERMANENTLY FILED 11/13 SENATE RESOLVE 4
2017-03-08Senate9:25 AM 3/8/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2017-02-27SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2017-02-27SenateFN1: ZERO(S.RLS)
2017-02-27SenateBEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
2017-02-27SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-02-27SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 2/27/2017
2017-02-22SenateDP: EGAN, COGHILL
2017-02-22SenateNR: DUNLEAVY, GIESSEL, WILSON
2017-02-22SenateSTA RPT 2DP 3NR
2017-02-17SenateCOSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE
2017-02-15SenateDP: HUGHES, BEGICH, GIESSEL, STEVENS
2017-02-15SenateEDC RPT 4DP
2017-02-13SenateCOSPONSOR(S): VON IMHOF
2017-02-01SenateSTEVENS, KELLY, HUGHES, MEYER
2017-02-01SenateCOSPONSOR(S): GARDNER, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, EGAN, MACKINNON, COSTELLO, BISHOP,
2017-02-01SenateEDC, STA
2017-02-01SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback