AK SR11 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 SENATE RESOLVE 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to the mining and processing of rare earth elements in Alaska and to the stockpiling of rare earth elements; and urging the United States Congress to pass H.R. 4866.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mining/processing Of Rare Earth Elements

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-27 PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 SENATE RESOLVE 8
2010-07-09 MANIFEST ERROR(S)
2010-07-09 11:36 AM 5/17/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2010-04-14 PASSED Y20 N-
2010-04-14 BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
2010-04-14 TAKEN UP AND READ THE SECOND TIME
2010-04-09 READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback