AK SJR9 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - PERMANENTLY FILED 4/9 LEGIS RESOLVE 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - PERMANENTLY FILED 4/9 LEGIS RESOLVE 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urge Exemption For Cruise Ships
Title
Urge Exemption For Cruise Ships
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSJR 9(L&C) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | Senate | PERMANENTLY FILED 4/9 LEGIS RESOLVE 1 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | 4:30 P.M. 4/8/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-04-07 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N- |
2021-03-31 | House | VERSION: CSSJR 9(L&C) AM H |
2021-03-31 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2021-03-31 | House | PASSED Y38 N2 |
2021-03-31 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 9(L&C) AM H |
2021-03-31 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-03-31 | House | AM NO 1 AS AMD ADOPTED UC |
2021-03-31 | House | AM 3 TO AM 1 ADOPTED Y32 N8 |
2021-03-31 | House | AM 2 TO AM 1 NOT OFFERED |
2021-03-31 | House | AM 1 TO AM 1 FAILED Y17 N23 |
2021-03-31 | House | AM NO 1 BEFORE HOUSE |
2021-03-31 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING |
2021-03-29 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, STORY |
2021-03-29 | House | HELD IN SECOND READING TO 3/31 CALENDAR |
2021-03-29 | House | AM NO 1 OFFERED AND PENDING |
2021-03-29 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-03-26 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2021-03-24 | House | FN1: ZERO(S.TRA) |
2021-03-24 | House | DP: DRUMMOND, CRONK, HANNAN, SPOHNHOLZ, MCKAY, MCCABE, HOPKINS |
2021-03-24 | House | TRA RPT 7DP |
2021-03-20 | House | TRA |
2021-03-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-03-19 | Senate | VERSION: CSSJR 9(L&C) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N- E3 A1 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 9(L&C) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-03-19 | Senate | L&C CS ADOPTED UC |
2021-03-19 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-03-19 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(S.TRA) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | DP: STEVENS, GRAY-JACKSON, REVAK, HOLLAND |
2021-03-17 | Senate | L&C RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE |
2021-02-19 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(S.TRA) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | NR: SHOWER |
2021-02-19 | Senate | DP: MYERS, KIEHL |
2021-02-19 | Senate | TRA RPT 2DP 1NR |
2021-02-10 | Senate | VON IMHOF, MICCICHE |
2021-02-10 | Senate | COSTELLO, REINBOLD, STEVENS, BISHOP, STEDMAN, HOLLAND, HUGHES, |
2021-02-10 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, GRAY-JACKSON, WILSON, REVAK, |
2021-02-10 | Senate | TRA, L&C |
2021-02-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |