AK SJR8 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - PERMANENTLY FILED 6/16 LEGIS RESOLVE 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - PERMANENTLY FILED 6/16 LEGIS RESOLVE 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Completion Of University Land Grant
Title
Completion Of University Land Grant
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Senate | PERMANENTLY FILED 6/16 LEGIS RESOLVE 4 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | 2:00 P.M. 6/15/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-04-19 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): WOOL, JOSEPHSON |
2021-04-19 | House | VERSION: CSSJR 8(RES) |
2021-04-19 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2021-04-19 | House | PASSED Y36 E4 |
2021-04-19 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 8(RES) |
2021-04-19 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-04-19 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-04-19 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | FN1: ZERO(S.EDC) |
2021-04-14 | House | PATKOTAK |
2021-04-14 | House | DP: SCHRAGE, GILLHAM, HANNAN, RAUSCHER, CRONK, FIELDS, MCKAY, HOPKINS, |
2021-04-14 | House | RES RPT 9DP |
2021-03-24 | House | RES |
2021-03-24 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-03-22 | Senate | VERSION: CSSJR 8(RES) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | HUGHES, MICCICHE |
2021-03-22 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, REVAK, VON IMHOF, HOLLAND, BISHOP, STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, |
2021-03-22 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 8(RES) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-03-22 | Senate | RES CS ADOPTED UC |
2021-03-22 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-03-22 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(S.EDC) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | DP: REVAK, STEVENS, MICCICHE, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, KIEHL |
2021-03-17 | Senate | RES RPT CS 6DP NEW TITLE |
2021-02-17 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(S.EDC) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | DP: HOLLAND, HUGHES, STEVENS, MICCICHE, BEGICH |
2021-02-17 | Senate | EDC RPT 5DP |
2021-02-05 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, BEGICH, MYERS, GRAY-JACKSON |
2021-02-03 | Senate | EDC, RES |
2021-02-03 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Dedicated Funds
Education
Governor
Grants
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Public Land
Statehood Act
Universities
Education
Governor
Grants
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Public Land
Statehood Act
Universities