AK SJR8 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
U.s.-mexico-canada Agreement On Trade
Title
U.s.-mexico-canada Agreement On Trade
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE |
2019-04-16 | House | L&C |
2019-04-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-04-15 | Senate | VERSION: SJR 8 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2019-04-15 | 833 | |
2019-04-15 | 833 | |
2019-04-15 | 832 | |
2019-04-15 | 831 | |
2019-04-15 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS UC |
2019-04-15 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 8 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/15 CALENDAR |
2019-04-12 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-04-12 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2019 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | FN1: ZERO (S.L&C) |
2019-03-29 | Senate | DP: REINBOLD, BIRCH, BISHOP, COSTELLO |
2019-03-29 | Senate | L&C RPT 4DP |
2019-03-01 | Senate | L&C |
2019-03-01 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |