AK SJR7 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - PERMANENTLY FILED 3/18 LEGIS RESOLVE 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Endorsing Anwr Leasing; Related Issues

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Endorsing Anwr Leasing; Related Issues

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to SJR 7 (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 12 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt RES CS (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Sustain Ruling of the Chair (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 6 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 6 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenatePERMANENTLY FILED 3/18 LEGIS RESOLVE 1
2019-03-13Senate3:40 P.M. 3/12/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2019-03-11SenateCOGHILL, SHOWER, GIESSEL
2019-03-11SenateCOSPONSOR(S): BISHOP, HUGHES, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, COSTELLO
2019-03-11SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y18 N1 E1
2019-03-11SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
2019-03-11HouseVERSION: HCS SJR 7(RES)
2019-03-11HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2019-03-11HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): WILSON, JOHNSTON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, JOHNSON
2019-03-11HouseENGROSSMENT WAIVED, RULE 43(B)
2019-03-11HousePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y36 N3 E1
2019-03-11HouseRECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
2019-03-11HouseTHOMPSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2019-03-11HousePASSED Y36 N3 E1
2019-03-11HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS SJR 7(RES)
2019-03-11HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-03-11 293
2019-03-11 293
2019-03-11HouseRES HCS ADOPTED Y39 E1
2019-03-11HouseSUSTAINED RULING OF CHAIR Y28 N11 E1
2019-03-11HouseOBJECTION RULED OUT OF ORDER
2019-03-11HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-03-11HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/11/2019
2019-03-11HouseFN1: ZERO(S.RES)
2019-03-11HouseAM: TUCK, SPOHNHOLZ
2019-03-11HouseNR: HOPKINS
2019-03-11HouseDNP: HANNAN
2019-03-11HouseDP: TALERICO, RAUSCHER, RASMUSSEN, LINCOLN
2019-03-11HouseRES RPT HCS(RES) 4DP 1DNP 1NR 2AM
2019-03-06HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER, TUCK, KOPP
2019-03-06HouseRES
2019-03-06HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-03-04SenateVERSION: SJR 7
2019-03-04SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2019-03-04SenatePASSED Y16 N2 E2
2019-03-04SenateAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2019-03-04 451
2019-03-04SenateRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM #3 UC
2019-03-04SenateAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2019-03-04 450
2019-03-04 449
2019-03-04SenateRETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS UC
2019-03-04SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SJR 7
2019-03-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/4 CALENDAR
2019-03-01SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-03-01SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/01/2019
2019-02-27SenateFN1: ZERO(S.RES)
2019-02-27SenateAM: KAWASAKI
2019-02-27SenateNR: KIEHL
2019-02-27SenateDP: BIRCH, GIESSEL, COGHILL, BISHOP, REINBOLD
2019-02-27SenateRES RPT 5DP 1NR 1AM
2019-02-20SenateRES
2019-02-20SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/31?Root=SJR7
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/SJR007A.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/SJR007B.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/SJR007Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=S&Bill=SJR7&Page=00449#0449
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=S&Bill=SJR7&Page=00451#0451
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=S&Bill=SJR7&Page=00452#0452
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=SJR7&Page=00292#0292
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=SJR7&Page=00293#0293
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=SJR7&Page=00295#0295
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=S&Bill=SJR7&Page=00509#0509

Bill Comments

feedback