AK SJR6 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-21 - PERMANENTLY FILED 2/17 LEGIS RESOLVE 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the United States Army and United States Air Force to extend the public comment period for the scoping phase of the Joint Pacific Alaska Range Complex Modernization and Enhancement Environmental Impact Statement, which is set to end February 18, 2011, for a minimum of 30 days to allow for effective communication and full state and user involvement during the comment period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jt. Pacific Alaska Range Complex Changes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-21 PERMANENTLY FILED 2/17 LEGIS RESOLVE 2
2011-02-17 5:01 PM 2/16/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2011-02-16 CONCUR AM OF (H) Y18 N- E2
2011-02-16 CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
2011-02-16 VERSION: CSSJR 6(TRA) AM H
2011-02-16 TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2011-02-16 PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y36 E3 A1
2011-02-16 RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
2011-02-16 JOHNSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2011-02-16 PASSED Y36 E3 A1
2011-02-16 READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 6(TRA) AM H
2011-02-16 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2011-02-16 ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2011-02-16 AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2011-02-16 READ THE SECOND TIME
2011-02-16 RULES TO CALENDAR 2/16/2011
2011-02-16 FN1: ZERO(S.TRA)
2011-02-16 DP: JOHNSON, FEIGE, PRUITT, MUNOZ, PETERSEN, GRUENBERG, P.WILSON
2011-02-16 TRA RPT 7DP
2011-02-11 TRA
2011-02-11 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2011-02-09 VERSION: CSSJR 6(TRA)
2011-02-09 TRANSMITTED TO (H)
2011-02-09 PASSED Y19 N- A1
2011-02-09 READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 6(TRA)
2011-02-09 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2011-02-09 TRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2011-02-09 READ THE SECOND TIME
2011-02-09 RULES TO CALENDAR 2/9/2011
2011-02-09 FN1: ZERO(S.TRA)
2011-02-09 DP: KOOKESH, THOMAS, HUGGINS
2011-02-09 TRA RPT CS 3DP NEW TITLE
2011-02-04 TRA
2011-02-04 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback