AK SJR5 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-04 - FOURTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Const. Am: Approp Limit; Budget Reserve

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Const. Am: Approp Limit; Budget Reserve

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-04HouseFOURTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL
2021-10-04SenateFOURTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL
2021-08-16HouseTHIRD SPECIAL SESSION BILL
2021-08-16SenateTHIRD SPECIAL SESSION BILL
2021-05-10SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2021-05-10SenateFN1: ZERO(GOV)
2021-05-10SenateNR: SHOWER
2021-05-10SenateDNP: KIEHL
2021-05-10SenateDP: HOLLAND, MYERS, HUGHES
2021-05-10SenateJUD RPT CS 3DP 1DNP 1NR SAME TITLE
2021-02-24SenateFN1: ZERO(GOV)
2021-02-24SenateAM: KAWASAKI
2021-02-24SenateNR: SHOWER, COSTELLO
2021-02-24SenateDP: HOLLAND
2021-02-24SenateSTA RPT 1DP 2NR 1AM
2021-01-22SenateGOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
2021-01-22SenateFN1: ZERO(GOV)
2021-01-22SenateSTA, JUD, FIN
2021-01-22SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback