AK SJR5 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 4/29 LEGIS RESOLVE 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 4/29 LEGIS RESOLVE 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the United States Department of Defense to continue to provide retirement benefits for members of the Alaska Territorial Guard who served during World War II.
Title
Ak Territorial Guard Retirement Benefits
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-05 | PERMANENTLY FILED 4/29 LEGIS RESOLVE 4 | |
2009-03-25 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2009-03-25 | 9:05 AM 3/24/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2009-03-19 | VERSION: CSSJR 5(FIN) | |
2009-03-19 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2009-03-19 | PASSED Y33 E4 A3 | |
2009-03-19 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 5(FIN) | |
2009-03-19 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-03-19 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-03-19 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2009 | |
2009-03-05 | FN1: ZERO(S.FIN/ALL DEPTS) | |
2009-03-05 | DP: GATTO, SEATON, GRUENBERG, LYNN | |
2009-03-05 | STA RPT 4DP | |
2009-02-18 | FN1: ZERO(S.FIN/ALL DEPTS) | |
2009-02-18 | DP: KAWASAKI, OLSON, BUCH, LYNN, GATTO | |
2009-02-18 | MLV RPT 5DP | |
2009-02-06 | MLV, STA | |
2009-02-06 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-02-04 | VERSION: CSSJR 5(FIN) | |
2009-02-04 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2009-02-04 | PASSED Y19 N- E1 | |
2009-02-04 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 5(FIN) | |
2009-02-04 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-02-04 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-02-04 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-02-04 | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/4/2009 | |
2009-02-04 | FN1: ZERO(S.FIN/ALL DEPTS) | |
2009-02-04 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, ELTON, HUGGINS, THOMAS, OLSON, ELLIS | |
2009-02-04 | FIN RPT CS 7DP NEW TITLE | |
2009-01-28 | FIN | |
2009-01-28 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |