AK SJR4 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the United States Congress to pass legislation providing for the exemption of legally acquired walrus, mammoth, and mastodon ivory from laws that ban the sale, use, and possession of ivory.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ak Legally Acquired Ivory Use Exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-04-23HouseTHOMPSON, KITO
2018-04-23HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, REINBOLD, TARR, MILLETT, ZULKOSKY, JOHNSON,
2018-04-23HouseVERSION: CSSJR 4(RES)
2018-04-23HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-04-23HousePASSED Y38 N1 E1
2018-04-23HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 4(RES)
2018-04-23HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-23HouseAM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2018-04-23HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-23HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/23/2018
2018-04-16HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): LINCOLN
2018-04-15HouseFN2: ZERO(S.RES)
2018-04-15HouseAM: EASTMAN
2018-04-15HouseNR: LEDOUX
2018-04-15HouseDP: KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, STUTES, CLAMAN
2018-04-15HouseJUD RPT 4DP 1NR 1AM
2018-04-05HouseFN2: ZERO(S.RES)
2018-04-05HouseNR: RAUSCHER
2018-04-05HouseDP: DRUMMOND, LINCOLN, TALERICO, PARISH, ZULKOSKY
2018-04-05HouseCRA RPT 5DP 1NR
2018-02-19HouseCRA, JUD
2018-02-19HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-02-16SenateVERSION: CSSJR 4(RES)
2018-02-16SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-02-16SenatePASSED Y16 N- E3 V1
2018-02-16SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 4(RES)
2018-02-16SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-02-16SenateRES CS ADOPTED UC
2018-02-16SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-02-16SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 2/16/2018
2018-01-31SenateFN2: ZERO(S.RES)
2018-01-31SenateDP: GIESSEL, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, VON IMHOF, STEDMAN, MEYER
2018-01-31SenateRES RPT CS 6DP NEW TITLE
2017-04-05SenateFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2017-04-05SenateDP: BISHOP, GARDNER, MACKINNON, STEDMAN
2017-04-05SenateCRA RPT 4DP
2017-02-01SenateCOSPONSOR(S): GARDNER, BEGICH, STEDMAN, BISHOP, EGAN
2017-02-01SenateCRA, RES
2017-02-01SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback