AK SJR28 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 39
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 39
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to the Ecumenical Patriarchate and religious rights.
Title
Ecumenical Patriarchate Of Turkey
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Meyer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-27 | PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 39 | |
2010-07-09 | 2:55 PM 6/14/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-11 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN | |
2010-04-11 | VERSION: SJR 28 | |
2010-04-11 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-11 | PASSED Y40 | |
2010-04-11 | READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 28 | |
2010-04-11 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-11 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-11 | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/11/2010 | |
2010-04-09 | FN1: ZERO(S.JUD) | |
2010-04-09 | NR: KERTTULA | |
2010-04-09 | DP: OLSON, HERRON, GARDNER, NEUMAN, DAHLSTROM | |
2010-04-09 | RLS RPT 5DP 1NR | |
2010-04-06 | RLS | |
2010-04-06 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-04-05 | VERSION: SJR 28 | |
2010-04-05 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-04-05 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-05 | READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 28 | |
2010-04-05 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-05 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-05 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2010 | |
2010-04-01 | FN1: ZERO(S.JUD) | |
2010-04-01 | DP: FRENCH, COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI | |
2010-04-01 | JUD RPT 3DP | |
2010-02-18 | JUD | |
2010-02-18 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |