AK SJR27 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - PERMANENTLY FILED 6/25 LEGIS RESOLVE 37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - PERMANENTLY FILED 6/25 LEGIS RESOLVE 37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the federal government to provide funding for domestic seafood marketing and promotional activities.
Title
Fed. Funding: Domestic Seafood Marketing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | PERMANENTLY FILED 6/25 LEGIS RESOLVE 37 | |
2010-07-09 | 2:55 PM 6/14/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-06 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, MUNOZ, KERTTULA, GUTTENBERG, TUCK, EDGMON | |
2010-04-06 | VERSION: CSSJR 27(RES) | |
2010-04-06 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-06 | PASSED Y35 E4 A1 | |
2010-04-06 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 27(RES) | |
2010-04-06 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-06 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-06 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2010 | |
2010-03-29 | FN1: ZERO(S.RES) | |
2010-03-29 | DP: OLSON, GUTTENBERG, TUCK, SEATON, P.WILSON, JOHNSON, NEUMAN | |
2010-03-29 | RES RPT 7DP | |
2010-03-24 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): P.WILSON | |
2010-03-17 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN | |
2010-03-17 | RES | |
2010-03-17 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-15 | VERSION: CSSJR 27(RES) | |
2010-03-15 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-03-15 | PASSED Y19 N- E1 | |
2010-03-15 | ELLIS, HOFFMAN, KOOKESH, OLSON, DAVIS, WAGONER, COGHILL, DYSON, THOMAS, STEVENS | |
2010-03-15 | COSPONSOR(S): HUGGINS, STEDMAN, MEYER, MCGUIRE, WIELECHOWSKI, MENARD, PASKVAN, | |
2010-03-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 27(RES) | |
2010-03-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-15 | RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-15 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/15/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | FN1: ZERO(S.RES) | |
2010-03-10 | DP: MCGUIRE, WIELECHOWSKI, HUGGINS, STEVENS, FRENCH | |
2010-03-10 | RES RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE | |
2010-02-12 | RES | |
2010-02-12 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |