AK SJR25 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-19 - PERMANENTLY FILED 5/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-19 - PERMANENTLY FILED 5/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting Ukraine
Title
Supporting Ukraine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House: Second Reading Advance to Third Reading on the Same Day (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 7 (Y: 3 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-03-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 5 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 4 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Waive from Rules Committee (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House: Second Reading Advance to Third Reading on the Same Day (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 7 (Y: 3 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-03-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 5 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 4 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Waive from Rules Committee (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | PERMANENTLY FILED 5/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 13 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | 2:00 P.M. 4/19/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-04-07 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2022-03-18 | House | VERSION: SJR 25 AM |
2022-03-18 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2022-03-18 | House | PASSED Y32 N4 E4 |
2022-03-18 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 25 AM |
2022-03-18 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING Y32 N4 E4 |
2022-03-18 | House | AM NO 7 FAILED Y3 N32 E4 A1 |
2022-03-18 | House | AM NO 6 FAILED Y6 N29 E4 A1 |
2022-03-18 | House | AM NO 5 NOT OFFERED |
2022-03-18 | House | AM NO 4 NOT OFFERED |
2022-03-18 | House | AM NO 3 FAILED Y5 N31 E4 |
2022-03-18 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y12 N24 E4 |
2022-03-18 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y4 N32 E4 |
2022-03-18 | House | AM 1 TO AM 1 OFFERED AND WITHDAWN |
2022-03-18 | House | AM NO 1 OFFERED |
2022-03-18 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-03-16 | House | HELD TO 3/18 CALENDAR |
2022-03-16 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-14 | House | RLS REFERRAL WAIVED FOR CALENDAR Y31 N5 E4 |
2022-03-14 | House | RLS |
2022-03-14 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-03-09 | Senate | VERSION: SJR 25 AM |
2022-03-09 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | PASSED Y14 N- E5 A1 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2022-03-09 | Senate | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2022-03-09 | Senate | AM NO 3 ADOPTED UC |
2022-03-09 | Senate | AM NO 2 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN UC |
2022-03-09 | Senate | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2022-03-09 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS UC |
2022-03-09 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 25 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/9 CAL |
2022-03-08 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-03-08 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | RLS REFERRAL WAIVED UC |
2022-03-04 | Senate | RLS |
2022-03-04 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |