AK SJR16 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - REFERRED TO FISHERIES
Pending: House Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

End Russia Embargo On U.s. Seafood

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

End Russia Embargo On U.s. Seafood

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19HouseREFERRED TO FISHERIES
2021-05-19HouseFSH
2021-05-19HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-05-19SenateVERSION: SJR 16
2021-05-19SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2021-05-19SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2021-05-19SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SJR 16
2021-05-18SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/19 CALENDAR
2021-05-18SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-05-18SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2021
2021-05-18SenateFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2021-05-18SenateNR: KAWASAKI
2021-05-18SenateDP: REVAK, KIEHL, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, STEVENS
2021-05-18SenateRES RPT 5DP 1NR
2021-05-12SenateRES REFERRAL REPLACED WTR
2021-05-11SenateWTR
2021-05-11SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback