AK SJR15 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - PERMANENTLY FILED 4/27 LEGIS RESOLVE 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizing Alaska/canada Relationship

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing Alaska/canada Relationship

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to SJR 15 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 13 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-16 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 13 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-29SenatePERMANENTLY FILED 4/27 LEGIS RESOLVE 12
2022-04-19Senate2:00 P.M. 4/19/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2022-04-07SenateMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2022-03-18SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y17 N- E2 A1
2022-03-18SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
2022-03-16HouseVERSION: HCS SJR 15(L&C)
2022-03-16HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2022-03-16HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
2022-03-16HousePASSED Y37 N2 E1
2022-03-16HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS SJR 15(L&C)
2022-03-16HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2022-03-16HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y19 N20 E1
2022-03-16HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y13 N26 E1
2022-03-16HouseL&C HCS ADOPTED UC
2022-03-16HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2022-03-16HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/16/2022
2022-02-28HouseFN2: ZERO(H.L&C)
2022-02-28HouseDP: SCHRAGE, MCCARTY, NELSON, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ
2022-02-28HouseL&C RPT HCS(L&C) 5DP
2022-02-25HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): MCCARTY
2021-05-15HouseL&C
2021-05-15HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-05-14SenateVERSION: SJR 15
2021-05-14SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2021-05-14SenatePASSED Y18 N- E2
2021-05-14SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SJR 15
2021-05-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2021-05-14SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-05-14SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2021
2021-05-07SenateFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2021-05-07SenateDP: COSTELLO, REVAK, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS
2021-05-07SenateL&C RPT 4DP
2021-04-28SenateL&C
2021-04-28SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback