AK SJR15 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 23-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-02 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-02 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Opposing any international designation of Alaska land or water as an international park, world heritage site, biosphere reserve, Ramsar site, or other classification of land or water that affects the use of land or water by the state or an Alaska Native corporation without approval by the United States Congress and the Alaska State Legislature; requesting the United States Department of State and the United States Department of the Interior to cease all further action related to an international designation for land and water in the state until the action is approved by the United States Congress and the Alaska State Legislature; requesting that the United States Congress pass legislation requiring Congressional approval of any international designation that affects the use of land or water by the state or the United States; requesting that the governor be involved in the process and development of any joint action plan; requesting that the state, including the departments responsible for the management of fish and wildlife and other natural resources, be an integral part of any discussion, agreement, understanding, or other process that affects the use or development of fish and wildlife and other natural resources in the state; and urging the governor and the attorney general to reserve all legal remedies for a taking of the natural resources of the state by an international designation of land and water in the state.
Title
Oppose International Designating Of Land
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Amendment to SJR 15? (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate:
2014-04-03 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate:
SJR 15 Third Reading - Final Passage(Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14 |
2014-07-02 | Senate | 9:25 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-04 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1 |
2014-04-20 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2014-04-03 | House | VERSION: HCS SJR 15(RES) |
2014-04-03 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2014-04-03 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MILLETT, LEDOUX, LYNN |
2014-04-03 | House | PASSED Y35 N3 E2 |
2014-04-03 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SJR 15(RES) |
2014-04-03 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-03 | House | RES HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-03 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-03 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): ISAACSON, OLSON |
2014-03-13 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GATTIS, T.WILSON |
2014-03-05 | House | FN1: ZERO(S.RES) |
2014-03-05 | House | NR: KAWASAKI, TARR |
2014-03-05 | House | DP: JOHNSON, HAWKER, SEATON, OLSON, P.WILSON |
2014-03-05 | House | RES RPT HCS(RES) 5DP 2NR |
2014-03-03 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOHNSON |
2014-02-19 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): FEIGE, HUGHES |
2014-02-19 | House | RES |
2014-02-19 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-02-18 | Senate | VERSION: SJR 15 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-02-18 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, STEVENS, OLSON, EGAN |
2014-02-18 | Senate | BEFORE THE SENATE IN THIRD READING |
2014-02-14 | Senate | HELD IN THIRD READING TO 2/18 CALENDAR |
2014-02-14 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 15 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): FAIRCLOUGH, STEDMAN, MEYER |
2014-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/14 CALENDAR |
2014-02-12 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-02-12 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/12/2014 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): DYSON, MICCICHE, DUNLEAVY, BISHOP, COGHILL, HUGGINS, KELLY |
2014-02-10 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(S.RES) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | DP: GIESSEL, MICCICHE, BISHOP, DYSON, FAIRCLOUGH |
2014-02-10 | Senate | RES RPT 5DP |
2014-01-22 | Senate | RES |
2014-01-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Attorney General
Boundaries
Corporations
Economic Development
Economy
Environmental Concerns
Fish & Game (both)
Governor
Intergovernmental Relations
International Relations
Land
Minerals
Mining
Native Organizations
Natives
Resources
Subsistence
Water
Boundaries
Corporations
Economic Development
Economy
Environmental Concerns
Fish & Game (both)
Governor
Intergovernmental Relations
International Relations
Land
Minerals
Mining
Native Organizations
Natives
Resources
Subsistence
Water