AK SJR14 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Alaska relating to notice and consent before termination of a minor's pregnancy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Const. Am: Parental Consent To Abortion

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10SenateCOSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
2018-03-28SenateCOSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL
2018-02-26SenateCOSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, MICCICHE, MACKINNON, MEYER, WILSON, COGHILL, KELLY
2018-02-19SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2018-02-19SenateJUD, FIN
2018-02-19SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback