AK SJR13 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - REFERRED TO RESOURCES
Pending: House Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the United States Congress to amend the Marine Mammal Protection Act; urging certain federal agencies to permit Alaska Native organizations and the Alaska Department of Fish and Game to co-manage, take, and study sea otters; and urging the United States Secretary of the Interior to review evidence and waive certain provisions of the moratorium on taking sea otters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Co-management Plan For Sea Otters

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29HouseREFERRED TO RESOURCES
2018-03-29HouseRES
2018-03-29HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-03-28SenateVERSION: CSSJR 13(RES)
2018-03-28SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-03-28SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2018-03-28SenateCOGHILL, EGAN, KELLY
2018-03-28SenateCOSPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, SHOWER, STEVENS, GIESSEL, MACKINNON, MICCICHE, BISHOP
2018-03-28SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 13(RES)
2018-03-28SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-03-28SenateRES CS ADOPTED UC
2018-03-28SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-03-28SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/28/2018
2018-03-21SenateFN1: ZERO(S.RES)
2018-03-21SenateNR: WIELECHOWSKI
2018-03-21SenateDP: GIESSEL, BISHOP, COGHILL, VON IMHOF, STEDMAN, MEYER
2018-03-21SenateRES RPT CS 6DP 1NR NEW TITLE
2018-02-19SenateCOSPONSOR(S): WILSON
2018-02-19SenateRES
2018-02-19SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback