AK SJR12 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/26 LEGIS RESOLVE 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/26 LEGIS RESOLVE 24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Social Security Benefit Reduction Repeal
Title
Social Security Benefit Reduction Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-05 | Senate | PERMANENTLY FILED 8/26 LEGIS RESOLVE 24 |
2022-10-05 | Senate | 11:08 A.M. 8/22/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-10-05 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2022-05-18 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE, JOSEPHSON |
2022-05-18 | House | VERSION: SJR 12 |
2022-05-18 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2022-05-18 | House | PASSED Y36 A4 |
2022-05-18 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 12 |
2022-05-18 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-05-18 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-18 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2022 |
2022-05-18 | House | LIMIT ALL INTROS TO 3 MIN, DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y36 N4 |
2022-05-02 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND |
2022-04-29 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): STORY |
2022-04-04 | House | FN2: ZERO(S.FIN) |
2022-04-04 | House | NR: KAUFMAN, NELSON |
2022-04-04 | House | DP: SCHRAGE, MCCARTY, SNYDER, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ |
2022-04-04 | House | L&C RPT 5DP 2NR |
2022-03-14 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOPKINS, SPOHNHOLZ, TARR, FOSTER, TUCK, FIELDS, HANNAN |
2022-03-14 | House | L&C REPLACES STA REFERRAL |
2022-03-14 | House | STA |
2022-03-14 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-03-11 | Senate | VERSION: SJR 12 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | PASSED Y14 N- E5 A1 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 12 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): BEGICH |
2022-03-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/11 CAL |
2022-03-09 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-03-09 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(S.FIN) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON |
2022-03-04 | Senate | FIN RPT 6DP |
2021-05-07 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(S.STA) |
2021-05-07 | Senate | NR: HOLLAND, COSTELLO, REINBOLD |
2021-05-07 | Senate | DP: SHOWER |
2021-05-07 | Senate | STA RPT 1DP 3NR |
2021-05-05 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON |
2021-03-31 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): KIEHL, KAWASAKI |
2021-03-29 | Senate | STA, FIN |
2021-03-29 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Employment
Intergovernmental Relations
Law Enforcement
Military
Public Employees
Retirement
Social Security
Teachers
Intergovernmental Relations
Law Enforcement
Military
Public Employees
Retirement
Social Security
Teachers