AK SJR1 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - IN ACCORDANCE WITH UR 48(B) MOVED TO FINANCE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proposing amendments to the Constitution of the State of Alaska relating to the Alaska permanent fund, establishing the earnings reserve account, and relating to the permanent fund dividend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Const Am: Guarantee Perm Fund Dividend

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Discharge from Judiciary Committee (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Discharge from Judiciary Committee (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09SenateIN ACCORDANCE WITH UR 48(B) MOVED TO FINANCE
2018-04-06SenateJUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23 UC
2018-04-06SenateUR 48(A) REQUEST RECEIVED
2018-03-07SenateCOSPONSOR(S): WILSON
2018-03-07SenateMOTION TO DISCHARGE FROM JUD COMMITTEE FAILED Y7 N13
2018-02-28SenateMOTION TO DISCHARGE FROM JUD COMMITTEE FAILED Y6 N14
2017-03-08SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2017-03-08SenateFN1: ZERO(GOV)
2017-03-08SenateDNP: COGHILL
2017-03-08SenateNR: DUNLEAVY, EGAN, GIESSEL, WILSON
2017-03-08SenateSTA RPT 1DNP 4NR
2017-01-18SenateCOSPONSOR(S): BEGICH, GARDNER
2017-01-18SenateSTA, JUD, FIN
2017-01-18SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-18SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback