AK SCR6 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/17 LEGIS RESOLVE 10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/17 LEGIS RESOLVE 10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 39
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 39
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-16 | Senate | PERMANENTLY FILED 7/17 LEGIS RESOLVE 10 |
2023-10-16 | Senate | 11:40 A.M. 7/6/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-05-18 | House | VERSION: SCR 6 |
2023-05-18 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2023-05-18 | House | PASSED Y34 N6 |
2023-05-18 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2023-05-17 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2023-05-17 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 6 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2023-05-17 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N2 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2023-05-13 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |
Subjects
Agency
Airports
Alcohol
Appropriations
Arts & Humanities
Bonds & Bonding
Budget
Budget Reserve Fund
Buildings
Capital Projects
Collective Bargaining
Corrections
Courts
Debt
Economic Development
Economy
Education
Elections
Energy
Environmental Concerns
Executive Branch
Federal Aid
Fees
Fire Protection
Fish & Game (both)
Funds
Governor
Grants
Health & Social Services
Highways
Housing
Insurance
Labor
Leases
Legislature
Libraries
Loans
Marijuana
Marine Highway
Mental Health
Military
Minors
Motor Vehicles
Museums
Oil & Gas
Permanent Fund
Pioneers' Homes
Public Corporations
Public Employees
Public Finance
Public Officers
Public Safety
Retirement
Revenue
Salaries & Allowances
Schools
Special Appropriations
State Aid
Taxation
Transportation
Uniform Rules
Universities
Utilities
Vocational Training
Workers Compensation
Airports
Alcohol
Appropriations
Arts & Humanities
Bonds & Bonding
Budget
Budget Reserve Fund
Buildings
Capital Projects
Collective Bargaining
Corrections
Courts
Debt
Economic Development
Economy
Education
Elections
Energy
Environmental Concerns
Executive Branch
Federal Aid
Fees
Fire Protection
Fish & Game (both)
Funds
Governor
Grants
Health & Social Services
Highways
Housing
Insurance
Labor
Leases
Legislature
Libraries
Loans
Marijuana
Marine Highway
Mental Health
Military
Minors
Motor Vehicles
Museums
Oil & Gas
Permanent Fund
Pioneers' Homes
Public Corporations
Public Employees
Public Finance
Public Officers
Public Safety
Retirement
Revenue
Salaries & Allowances
Schools
Special Appropriations
State Aid
Taxation
Transportation
Uniform Rules
Universities
Utilities
Vocational Training
Workers Compensation